California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013