|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 6553.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1163.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1008.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 591.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|