California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB173 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill May 12, 2014
Bill August 8, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013