California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013
Bill March 12, 2013