LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB192
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB192
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB192
Compare Versions
SB192 Amended August 4, 2014
SB192 Amended June 18, 2014
SB192 Amended August 5, 2013
SB192 Amended June 14, 2013
SB192 Amended May 28, 2013
SB192 Amended April 16, 2013
SB192 Amended April 3, 2013
SB192 Amended March 12, 2013
SB192 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB192 Amended August 4, 2014
SB192 Amended June 18, 2014
SB192 Amended August 5, 2013
SB192 Amended June 14, 2013
SB192 Amended May 28, 2013
SB192 Amended April 16, 2013
SB192 Amended April 3, 2013
SB192 Amended March 12, 2013
SB192 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare