|
08/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2555.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 807.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 567.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|