California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013