California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013