LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB198
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB198
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB198
Compare Versions
SB198 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB198 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB198 Amended September 6, 2013
SB198 Amended August 5, 2013
SB198 Amended June 18, 2013
SB198 Amended May 6, 2013
SB198 Amended April 25, 2013
SB198 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB198 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB198 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB198 Amended September 6, 2013
SB198 Amended August 5, 2013
SB198 Amended June 18, 2013
SB198 Amended May 6, 2013
SB198 Amended April 25, 2013
SB198 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare