|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 915, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 34. Page 6495.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6339.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2013
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected April 1.)
|
|
|