California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014