California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill May 15, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013
Bill February 25, 2013