LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB2
Compare Versions
SB2 Amended August 14, 2013
SB2 Amended August 6, 2013
SB2 Amended May 15, 2013
SB2 Amended May 6, 2013
SB2 Amended April 23, 2013
SB2 Amended April 17, 2013
SB2 Amended February 25, 2013
SB2 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB2 Amended August 14, 2013
SB2 Amended August 6, 2013
SB2 Amended May 15, 2013
SB2 Amended May 6, 2013
SB2 Amended April 23, 2013
SB2 Amended April 17, 2013
SB2 Amended February 25, 2013
SB2 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare