|
06/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3756.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3729.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3685.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 421.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|