California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB20 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill June 6, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2014

Amended

Bill May 8, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014
Bill February 14, 2013