|
10/02/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 478, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2284.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 3013.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1097.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1008.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 404.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|