California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 15, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013