|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1946.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2599.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Corrected August 5.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Corrected June 27.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1110.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 590.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|