California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013