|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2375.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 3178.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 2504.) Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1092.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 989.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 751.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|