California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 13, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013