|
10/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 778, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2036.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2708.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2670.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2557.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 467.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|