California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 15, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 30, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013