California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill April 29, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013