LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB216
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB216
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB216
Compare Versions
SB216 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB216 Amended August 18, 2014
SB216 Amended April 29, 2013
SB216 Amended April 3, 2013
SB216 Amended March 18, 2013
SB216 Introduced February 11, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB216 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB216 Amended August 18, 2014
SB216 Amended April 29, 2013
SB216 Amended April 3, 2013
SB216 Amended March 18, 2013
SB216 Introduced February 11, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare