Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1170.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|