LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB22
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB22
Compare Versions
SB22 Amended July 2, 2013
SB22 Amended June 14, 2013
SB22 Amended May 28, 2013
SB22 Amended April 2, 2013
SB22 Amended February 26, 2013
SB22 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB22 Amended July 2, 2013
SB22 Amended June 14, 2013
SB22 Amended May 28, 2013
SB22 Amended April 2, 2013
SB22 Amended February 26, 2013
SB22 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare