|
07/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2248.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 590.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|