California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB233 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2013

Chaptered

Bill July 11, 2013

Amended

Bill May 15, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013