Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2597.) (January 15). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 2558.) (January 7). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2013
|
Set for hearing January 7 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|