LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB240
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB240
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB240
Compare Versions
SB240 Amended January 27, 2014
SB240 Amended January 21, 2014
SB240 Amended January 6, 2014
SB240 Amended April 11, 2013
SB240 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB240 Amended January 27, 2014
SB240 Amended January 21, 2014
SB240 Amended January 6, 2014
SB240 Amended April 11, 2013
SB240 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare