|
09/24/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 343, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2043.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 712.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 566.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|