California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2013

Amended

Bill August 7, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013