|
09/28/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2014
|
In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 25. Page 6756.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 291.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|