LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB25
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB25
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB25
Compare Versions
SB25 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB25 Amended August 21, 2014
SB25 Amended June 19, 2013
SB25 Amended June 5, 2013
SB25 Amended April 25, 2013
SB25 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB25 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB25 Amended August 21, 2014
SB25 Amended June 19, 2013
SB25 Amended June 5, 2013
SB25 Amended April 25, 2013
SB25 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare