|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2299.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3015.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 863.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 662.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|