LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB251
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB251
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB251
Compare Versions
SB251 Chaptered September 26, 2013
SB251 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB251 Amended September 3, 2013
SB251 Amended June 17, 2013
SB251 Amended June 5, 2013
SB251 Amended April 17, 2013
SB251 Amended March 18, 2013
SB251 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB251 Chaptered September 26, 2013
SB251 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB251 Amended September 3, 2013
SB251 Amended June 17, 2013
SB251 Amended June 5, 2013
SB251 Amended April 17, 2013
SB251 Amended March 18, 2013
SB251 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare