|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2841.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2795.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 941.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 882.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|