LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB258
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB258
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB258
Compare Versions
SB258 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB258 Amended August 30, 2013
SB258 Amended May 2, 2013
SB258 Amended March 19, 2013
SB258 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB258 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB258 Amended August 30, 2013
SB258 Amended May 2, 2013
SB258 Amended March 19, 2013
SB258 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare