California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB260 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013