LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB260
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB260
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB260
Compare Versions
SB260 Chaptered September 16, 2013
SB260 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB260 Amended September 3, 2013
SB260 Amended August 12, 2013
SB260 Amended June 27, 2013
SB260 Amended May 24, 2013
SB260 Amended April 4, 2013
SB260 Amended March 18, 2013
SB260 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB260 Chaptered September 16, 2013
SB260 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB260 Amended September 3, 2013
SB260 Amended August 12, 2013
SB260 Amended June 27, 2013
SB260 Amended May 24, 2013
SB260 Amended April 4, 2013
SB260 Amended March 18, 2013
SB260 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare