|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2486.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|