LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB262
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB262
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB262
Compare Versions
SB262 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB262 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SB262 Amended August 5, 2013
SB262 Amended June 12, 2013
SB262 Amended April 10, 2013
SB262 Amended April 1, 2013
SB262 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB262 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB262 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SB262 Amended August 5, 2013
SB262 Amended June 12, 2013
SB262 Amended April 10, 2013
SB262 Amended April 1, 2013
SB262 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare