|
09/30/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 436, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2435.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3276.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3059.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 2792.) Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 577.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 388.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|