California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013