|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Set for hearing August 29. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5014.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4998.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4939.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6635.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 6636.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Motion to reconsider continued to August 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 33. Page 6428.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 2.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 712.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|