LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB270
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB270
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB270
Compare Versions
SB270 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB270 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB270 Amended August 21, 2014
SB270 Amended August 18, 2014
SB270 Amended May 20, 2014
SB270 Amended March 27, 2014
SB270 Amended February 6, 2014
SB270 Introduced February 14, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB270 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB270 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB270 Amended August 21, 2014
SB270 Amended August 18, 2014
SB270 Amended May 20, 2014
SB270 Amended March 27, 2014
SB270 Amended February 6, 2014
SB270 Introduced February 14, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare