|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2043.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|