California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill July 1, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013