|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 564, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2181.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2828.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2669.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1092.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 989.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 753.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|